Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to limit the rate of increase of the part B Medicare premium to the rate of increase in Social Security benefits.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/16/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
09/29/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/22/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/16/1987Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/1987Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/16/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (98)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 09/16/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/06/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/06/1987
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 10/06/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 10/06/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 10/06/1987
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 10/06/1987
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 10/06/1987
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 10/06/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/06/1987
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 10/06/1987
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 10/06/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 10/06/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/06/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/06/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 10/06/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/06/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 10/06/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/06/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/06/1987
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 10/06/1987
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 10/06/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 10/06/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/06/1987
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/06/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/06/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/06/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 10/06/1987
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 10/06/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 10/06/1987
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 10/06/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/26/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 10/26/1987
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 10/26/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/26/1987
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 10/26/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 10/26/1987
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 10/26/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/26/1987
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 10/26/1987
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 10/26/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 10/26/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/26/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 10/26/1987
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 10/26/1987
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 10/26/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/26/1987
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 10/26/1987
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/26/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 10/26/1987
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 10/26/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 11/19/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/19/1987
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 11/19/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 11/19/1987
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/19/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 11/19/1987
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/19/1987
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 11/19/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 11/19/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 11/19/1987
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 11/19/1987
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 11/19/1987
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 11/19/1987
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 11/19/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 11/19/1987
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 11/19/1987
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/19/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 11/19/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 11/19/1987
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 11/19/1987
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 11/19/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 11/19/1987
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 11/19/1987
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 11/19/1987
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 11/19/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 11/19/1987
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 11/19/1987
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 11/19/1987
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 11/19/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 11/19/1987
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 01/25/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 01/25/1988
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 01/25/1988
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 01/25/1988
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 01/25/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 01/25/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 01/25/1988
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 01/25/1988
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 01/25/1988
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 01/25/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 01/25/1988
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 01/25/1988
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 01/25/1988
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 01/25/1988
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 04/21/1988
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/21/1988
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/21/1988

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce09/16/1987 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment09/29/1987 Referred to
House Ways and Means09/16/1987 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health09/22/1987 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3291.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3291. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/16/1987)

Amends part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance) of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to limit the rate of increase of the part B premium to the rate of increase of part B benefits.