Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 10/01/1987
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 02/09/1988
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 02/09/1988
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4] 02/09/1988
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 02/09/1988
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/09/1988
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 02/09/1988
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 02/09/1988
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 02/09/1988
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 02/09/1988
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 02/09/1988
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/09/1988
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 02/09/1988
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 02/09/1988
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 02/09/1988
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/09/1988
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/09/1988
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 02/09/1988
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/09/1988
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 02/09/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 02/09/1988
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/09/1988
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 02/09/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 02/09/1988
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 02/09/1988
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 02/09/1988
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 02/09/1988
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 02/25/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/1988
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 02/25/1988
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 02/25/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 02/25/1988
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 02/25/1988
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 02/25/1988
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 02/25/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 02/25/1988
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 02/25/1988
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/29/1988
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 02/29/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 02/29/1988
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 02/29/1988
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/01/1988
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/01/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/15/1988
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 03/15/1988
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/15/1988
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 03/15/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 03/15/1988
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/15/1988
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 03/15/1988
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 03/15/1988
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 03/15/1988
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 03/31/1988
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 03/31/1988
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 03/31/1988
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/31/1988
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 03/31/1988
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 03/31/1988
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 03/31/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/31/1988
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/20/1988
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 04/20/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 04/20/1988
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/03/1988
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 05/03/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/03/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/03/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/12/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 05/12/1988
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/19/1988
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 05/19/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 05/25/1988
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 06/07/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/07/1988
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 06/07/1988
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/07/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/07/1988
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 06/10/1988
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 07/12/1988
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 07/27/1988
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 07/27/1988