Committees: H.R.3400 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service10/01/1987 Referred to
10/06/1987 Markup by
10/15/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-376
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Civil Service10/05/1987 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Postal Personnel and Modernization10/05/1987 Referred to
Senate Governmental Affairs11/19/1987 Referred to
02/24/1988 Hearings by
05/19/1988 Markup by
07/07/1988 Reported by S.Rept 100-417