Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 02/17/1988
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/17/1988
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 02/17/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 02/17/1988
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/17/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 02/17/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 02/17/1988
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/17/1988
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 02/17/1988
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/23/1988
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/23/1988
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 02/23/1988
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 02/23/1988
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 02/23/1988
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 02/23/1988
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/25/1988
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 02/25/1988
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 02/25/1988
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 02/25/1988
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/25/1988
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 02/25/1988
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 02/29/1988
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/29/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 02/29/1988
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 02/29/1988
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 02/29/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/09/1988
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/09/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 03/09/1988
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 03/09/1988
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 03/09/1988
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 03/09/1988
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/09/1988
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/09/1988
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 03/09/1988
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/09/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/09/1988
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 03/09/1988
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 03/09/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 03/16/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 03/21/1988
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 03/21/1988
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 03/21/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 03/21/1988
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 03/21/1988
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/22/1988
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 03/23/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/30/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/30/1988
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/30/1988
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/30/1988
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/30/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 03/30/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/19/1988
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/19/1988
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 04/19/1988
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 04/19/1988
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 04/21/1988
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 04/21/1988
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/21/1988
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 04/21/1988
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/26/1988
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/26/1988
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 04/26/1988
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/28/1988
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/28/1988
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/04/1988
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/04/1988
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/04/1988
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 05/09/1988
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 05/24/1988
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 05/24/1988
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 05/24/1988
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/24/1988
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 05/24/1988
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 06/08/1988
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 06/08/1988
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/14/1988
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/14/1988
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/14/1988
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 06/14/1988
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/16/1988
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 06/16/1988
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 06/16/1988
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 06/21/1988
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 06/21/1988
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/21/1988
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/21/1988
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 06/21/1988
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 06/21/1988
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/21/1988
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 06/21/1988
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/21/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 06/21/1988
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/21/1988
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/21/1988
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/21/1988
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 06/21/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 06/21/1988
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 06/21/1988
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/21/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/07/1988
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/07/1988
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/13/1988