Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Notice to Lessees No. 5 Gas Royalty Act of 1987

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Notice to Lessees Numbered 5 (NTL-5) Gas Royalty Act of 1987

Short Titles as Reported to House

Notice to Lessees Numbered 5 (NTL-5) Gas Royalty Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to provide for adjustments of royalty payments under certain Federal onshore and Indian oil and gas leases, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (12)

Date Actions Overview
01/06/1988Became Public Law No: 100-234.
01/06/1988Signed by President.
12/30/1987Presented to President.
12/21/1987Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate receded from its amendment to the title by Voice Vote.
12/21/1987Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate amendment by Voice Vote.
12/18/1987Resolving differences -- House actions: House Disagreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/1987Resolving differences -- House actions: House Concurred, in Senate Amendments , with Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
12/09/1987Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
12/04/1987Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 100-234.
11/03/1987Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/15/1987Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-377.
10/13/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (31)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/06/1988Became Public Law No: 100-234.
01/06/1988Signed by President.
12/30/1987HousePresented to President.
12/30/1987SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
12/22/1987SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/1987SenateSenate receded from its amendment to the title by Voice Vote.
12/21/1987SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate amendment by Voice Vote.
12/19/1987SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment. And disagreement to the Senate amendment to the title.
12/18/1987HouseHouse Disagreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/1987HouseHouse Concurred, in Senate Amendments , with Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
12/15/1987SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/09/1987SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
12/04/1987SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 461.
12/04/1987SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 100-234.
12/02/1987SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported in lieu of S. 1814 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
11/04/1987SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Mineral Resources and Development.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
11/04/1987SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
11/03/1987HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
11/03/1987HouseHouse Agreed to Amendments Adopted by the Committee of the Whole.
11/03/1987HouseCalled up by House by Rule.
11/03/1987HouseRule Passed House.
11/03/1987HouseH.Amdt.480 Amendment Passed in Committee of the Whole by Voice Vote.
11/03/1987HouseH.Amdt.480 Amendment Offered by Representative Udall.
10/29/1987HouseRules Committee Resolution H.Res.299 Reported to House.
10/29/1987HouseCommittee on Rules Granted an Open Rule Providing One Hour of General Debate.
10/15/1987HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 237.
10/15/1987HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-377.
10/14/1987HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
10/14/1987HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
10/13/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
10/13/1987HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 10/13/1987

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs10/13/1987 Referred to
10/14/1987 Markup by
10/15/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-377
Senate Energy and Natural Resources11/04/1987 Referred to
12/02/1987 Markup by
12/04/1987 Reported by S.Rept 100-234
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Mineral Resources Development and Production11/04/1987 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3479. View summaries

Shown Here:
House agreed to Senate amendment with amendment (12/18/1987)

(House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment)

Notice to Lessees No. 5 Gas Royalty Act of 1987 - Sets forth the calculations to be used in determining the value for royalty purposes of gas production from Federal onshore or Indian oil and gas leases during the period January 1, 1982, through July 31, 1986, which is within the coverage of certain provisions of the Notice of Lessees and Operators of Federal and Indian Onshore Oil and Gas leases Published May 4, 1977, (NTL-5). Prescribes the written documentation which must be furnished in order for the Secretary of the Interior to make royalty value determinations. Excludes from the application of this Act certain lessees or royalty payors who received less than the highest applicable price through failure to collect certain amounts rather than because of market conditions.

Directs the Secretary to: (1) publish in the Federal Register and send to each lessee or royalty payor of record for any Federal onshore oil and gas lease and for any Indian oil and gas lease a notice of the enactment and provisions of this Act; (2) conduct a case-by-case audit of such leases to determine their payment status and implement appropriate payments or refunds; and (3) report to each Indian Tribe holding an Indian oil and gas lease within the coverage of NTL-5 the difference between royalties computed under NTL-5 and those computed under this Act. Prescribes procedures for refunding royalties previously paid for either Federal onshore or Indian oil and gas leases. Sets forth recordkeeping requirements for lessees and payors relating to the value of gas production for the period January 1, 1982, through July 31, 1986.