Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 01/06/1987
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 01/08/1987
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 01/08/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 01/08/1987
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 01/08/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/08/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 01/08/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 01/20/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 01/20/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/20/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 01/20/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/27/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 01/28/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 01/28/1987
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 01/28/1987
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/02/1987
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/02/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 02/02/1987
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 02/02/1987
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 02/05/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 02/05/1987
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 02/05/1987
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 02/05/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 02/10/1987
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 02/10/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 02/10/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 02/10/1987
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/10/1987
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 02/10/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 02/19/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/19/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 02/19/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 02/19/1987
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 02/19/1987
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 02/19/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/19/1987
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 02/19/1987
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 02/19/1987
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/19/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 02/19/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 02/24/1987
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 02/24/1987
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/24/1987
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 02/24/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 02/24/1987
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 02/24/1987
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 02/24/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 02/25/1987
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/03/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 03/03/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/03/1987
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/03/1987
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/03/1987
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 03/03/1987
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/03/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/03/1987
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 03/03/1987
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/1987