Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 10/20/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 11/09/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/09/1987
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 11/09/1987
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 11/09/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 11/09/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/09/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 11/09/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 11/09/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 11/09/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 11/09/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/09/1987
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 11/09/1987
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/09/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 11/09/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 11/09/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 11/09/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 11/09/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 11/09/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 11/09/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/09/1987
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 11/09/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 11/09/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 11/09/1987
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/09/1987
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 02/25/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 02/25/1988
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/25/1988
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 02/25/1988
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 02/25/1988
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 04/13/1988
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 05/17/1988
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/08/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 06/08/1988
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/08/1988
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 06/08/1988
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/08/1988
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 06/08/1988
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 06/08/1988
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 06/08/1988
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 06/08/1988
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/08/1988
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/08/1988
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 06/08/1988
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/08/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/08/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 06/08/1988
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/08/1988
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/08/1988
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/08/1988
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 06/08/1988
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/08/1988
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/08/1988
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/08/1988
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 06/08/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/08/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/08/1988
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 06/08/1988
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/08/1988
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/08/1988
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/08/1988
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 06/08/1988
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 06/08/1988
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/08/1988
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 06/08/1988
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 06/08/1988
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/08/1988
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 06/08/1988
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 06/08/1988
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 06/08/1988
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 06/08/1988
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 06/08/1988
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 06/08/1988
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/08/1988
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/08/1988
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 06/08/1988
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 06/08/1988
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/08/1988
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/08/1988
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 06/08/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/08/1988
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/08/1988
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/08/1988
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 06/08/1988
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/08/1988
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/08/1988
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/08/1988
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/08/1988
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 06/08/1988
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/08/1988
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 06/08/1988
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/08/1988
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/08/1988
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 06/08/1988
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 06/08/1988
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 06/08/1988
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 06/08/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/08/1988
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/08/1988
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 06/08/1988
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 06/08/1988
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 06/08/1988
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 06/08/1988
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/08/1988
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 06/09/1988
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/13/1988
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/13/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 07/13/1988
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 07/13/1988
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/13/1988
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 07/13/1988
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/13/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/13/1988
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 07/13/1988
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 07/13/1988
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 07/13/1988
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/13/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/13/1988
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 07/13/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/13/1988
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 07/13/1988
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/13/1988
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 07/13/1988
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 07/13/1988
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/13/1988
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/13/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/13/1988
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/13/1988
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 07/13/1988
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/19/1988
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 10/19/1988
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/19/1988
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 10/21/1988