Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/03/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 11/03/1987
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 11/09/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 11/09/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 11/09/1987
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 11/09/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/09/1987
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 12/17/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 12/17/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 12/17/1987
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 12/17/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 12/17/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 12/17/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 12/17/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/04/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 02/04/1988
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 02/04/1988
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 02/04/1988
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 02/04/1988
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/04/1988
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 02/04/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 02/04/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 02/04/1988
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 02/18/1988
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 02/18/1988
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/18/1988
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/25/1988
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 02/25/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 02/25/1988
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 03/02/1988
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/10/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/10/1988
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 03/23/1988
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/23/1988
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 04/27/1988