Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 12/21/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/16/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 02/16/1988
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 02/16/1988
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 02/16/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 02/16/1988
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/16/1988
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 02/16/1988
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 02/16/1988
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 02/16/1988
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 02/16/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 03/16/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/16/1988
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/16/1988
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/16/1988
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 03/16/1988
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/16/1988
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/16/1988
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/11/1988
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/11/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 04/11/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/11/1988
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 04/11/1988
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/11/1988
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/26/1988
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/26/1988
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 07/14/1988