Committees: H.R.3660 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor11/19/1987 Referred to
08/10/1988 Markup by
09/27/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-985 Part 1
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary, and Vocational Education12/16/1987 Referred to
08/04/1988 Discharged from
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Select Education12/16/1987 Referred to
08/04/1988 Discharged from
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Human Resources12/16/1987 Referred to
02/25/1988 Hearings by
06/30/1988 Markup by
06/30/1988 Reported by
House Ways and Means09/27/1988 Referred to