Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11]* 12/09/1987
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 12/09/1987
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/04/1988
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/04/1988
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/04/1988
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 05/04/1988
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 05/04/1988
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 05/04/1988
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/04/1988
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/04/1988
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/17/1988
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/17/1988
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/17/1988
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 05/17/1988
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 05/17/1988
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/17/1988
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/17/1988
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 05/17/1988
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/17/1988
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 05/17/1988
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/19/1988
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 05/26/1988
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/26/1988
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 05/26/1988
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 05/26/1988
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/26/1988
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 05/26/1988
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 05/26/1988
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 05/26/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/26/1988
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 05/26/1988
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 05/26/1988
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/08/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/08/1988
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 06/08/1988
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 06/08/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/08/1988
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 06/08/1988
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 06/16/1988
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/22/1988
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 06/23/1988
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/23/1988
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/30/1988
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/07/1988
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/07/1988
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 07/07/1988
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 07/07/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 07/07/1988
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/07/1988
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 07/12/1988
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 07/12/1988
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 07/13/1988
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 07/13/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/13/1988
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 07/14/1988
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 08/02/1988
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 08/02/1988
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 08/04/1988
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 09/09/1988
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 09/09/1988