Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to require that the Office of Personnel Management devise a plan on ways to reduce or eliminate delays in processing applications for benefits under the Civil Service Retirement System, in order to allow an individual to go from regular pay to retirement or disability retirement pay without interruption.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/17/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
12/29/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
12/29/1987Executive Comment Requested from OMB, OPM.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
12/17/1987Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/17/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (123)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 02/08/1988
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 02/16/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 02/16/1988
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/16/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 02/17/1988
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 02/17/1988
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/17/1988
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 02/17/1988
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 02/17/1988
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 02/17/1988
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 02/17/1988
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7] 03/01/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 03/01/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 03/01/1988
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/01/1988
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/01/1988
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/01/1988
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/01/1988
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/01/1988
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 03/01/1988
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/01/1988
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/01/1988
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 03/01/1988
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 03/01/1988
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 03/01/1988
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 03/03/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/03/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 03/07/1988
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 03/08/1988
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/09/1988
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 03/09/1988
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/10/1988
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 03/10/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 03/16/1988
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 03/16/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/16/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 03/21/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 03/21/1988
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/21/1988
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 03/21/1988
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 03/21/1988
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 03/21/1988
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/21/1988
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 03/21/1988
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 03/24/1988
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 03/24/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/24/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/24/1988
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 03/24/1988
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 03/24/1988
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 03/24/1988
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/30/1988
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/30/1988
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 03/30/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/30/1988
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 03/30/1988
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/30/1988
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/11/1988
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/11/1988
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 04/11/1988
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 04/11/1988
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 04/20/1988
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 04/20/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 04/20/1988
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 04/20/1988
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 04/25/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 04/25/1988
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 04/26/1988
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 04/26/1988
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 04/26/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 04/26/1988
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 04/26/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 04/26/1988
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 04/28/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 04/28/1988
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/28/1988
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 05/02/1988
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 05/02/1988
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/02/1988
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 05/04/1988
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/04/1988
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/04/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/04/1988
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 05/09/1988
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/09/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/11/1988
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 05/11/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/11/1988
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 05/11/1988
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 05/11/1988
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 05/18/1988
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/18/1988
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/19/1988
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/19/1988
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/01/1988
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 06/01/1988
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/01/1988
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/07/1988
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/23/1988
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/23/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/06/1988
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 07/06/1988
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 09/07/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service12/17/1987 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits12/29/1987 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3791.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3791. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/17/1987)

Requires the Office of Personnel Management to report, with recommendations, to the Congress on the problem of delays in processing applications for benefits under the Civil Service Retirement System.

Directs the Office to examine: (1) current methods and procedures; (2) circumstances where it might be appropriate to provide interim benefits; (3) the feasibility of processing records, forms, and other matters in anticipation of an employee's retirement; and (4) the effectiveness of retirement counselors. Requires the report to contain a plan to allow an individual to go from regular pay to retirement or disability retirement pay without interruption.