Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 04/20/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 04/20/1988
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 04/20/1988
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/26/1988
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/26/1988
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/26/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/26/1988
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 04/26/1988
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 04/26/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 04/26/1988
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/26/1988
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 04/26/1988
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/26/1988
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 04/26/1988
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 04/26/1988
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/26/1988
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 04/26/1988
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 04/26/1988
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 04/26/1988
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/26/1988
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/26/1988
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/26/1988
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 04/26/1988
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/26/1988
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/26/1988
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 04/26/1988
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 04/26/1988
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 04/26/1988
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 04/26/1988
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 04/26/1988
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 04/26/1988
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 04/26/1988
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/26/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 04/26/1988
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/26/1988
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/26/1988
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 04/26/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/26/1988
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 04/26/1988
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/10/1988
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/10/1988
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/10/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 05/10/1988
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/10/1988
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 05/10/1988
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 05/10/1988
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 05/10/1988
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/10/1988
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/10/1988
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 05/10/1988
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/10/1988
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 05/10/1988
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/10/1988
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 05/10/1988
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/10/1988
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 05/10/1988
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/10/1988
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/19/1988
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 06/02/1988
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 06/02/1988
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 06/02/1988
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 06/02/1988
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 06/14/1988
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/14/1988
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 06/14/1988
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 06/14/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/14/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/14/1988
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/14/1988
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/14/1988
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/14/1988
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/14/1988
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 06/14/1988
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/14/1988
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/14/1988
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/14/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 06/14/1988
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/14/1988
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/07/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 07/07/1988
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 07/27/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 08/02/1988
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 09/30/1988
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/30/1988
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/30/1988