Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 02/02/1988
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 02/02/1988
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 02/02/1988
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 02/03/1988
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/03/1988
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 02/03/1988
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/08/1988
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/08/1988
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 02/08/1988
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 02/08/1988
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 02/16/1988
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 02/16/1988
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 02/16/1988
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 02/16/1988
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 02/16/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 02/16/1988
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 02/16/1988
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/16/1988
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 02/16/1988
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 02/16/1988
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/16/1988
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 02/16/1988
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 02/16/1988
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/17/1988
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 02/17/1988
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 02/17/1988
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 02/17/1988
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 02/17/1988
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 02/17/1988
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 02/17/1988
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 02/23/1988
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 02/23/1988
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/23/1988
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 02/23/1988
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/23/1988
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 02/23/1988
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 02/23/1988
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/23/1988
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/23/1988
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 02/23/1988
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 02/25/1988
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/25/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 02/25/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 02/25/1988
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 03/01/1988
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 03/01/1988
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/01/1988
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 03/01/1988
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/01/1988
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/01/1988
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 03/01/1988
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 03/01/1988
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/01/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 03/03/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/03/1988
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/03/1988
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/03/1988
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 03/03/1988
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 03/03/1988
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/09/1988
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 03/09/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 03/09/1988
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 03/09/1988
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/09/1988
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/09/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/09/1988
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/09/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 03/09/1988
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 03/10/1988
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 03/10/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 03/10/1988
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/10/1988
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 03/10/1988
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 03/16/1988
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 03/16/1988
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 03/16/1988
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 03/16/1988
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/16/1988
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 03/16/1988
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/16/1988
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 03/22/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/22/1988
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/22/1988
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/23/1988
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 03/23/1988
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/23/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/23/1988
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/23/1988
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 03/24/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 03/28/1988
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/28/1988
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/28/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 03/29/1988
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/29/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 03/31/1988
Rep. Sweeney, David McCann [R-TX-14] 03/31/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/18/1988
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 04/18/1988
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 04/18/1988
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/18/1988
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/18/1988
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 04/19/1988
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 04/26/1988
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 04/26/1988
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 04/26/1988
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 04/26/1988
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 05/03/1988
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 05/03/1988
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 05/04/1988
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/10/1988
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/26/1988
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 05/26/1988
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/26/1988
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 06/22/1988
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 06/22/1988
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 06/27/1988
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/27/1988