Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Sweeney, David McCann [R-TX-14]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 02/18/1988
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 02/18/1988
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 02/18/1988
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 02/23/1988
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 02/23/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 02/23/1988
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/23/1988
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/23/1988
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 02/23/1988
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 02/29/1988
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 03/07/1988
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/07/1988
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 03/07/1988
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 03/07/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 03/08/1988
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/08/1988
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 03/10/1988
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/10/1988
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 03/10/1988
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/10/1988
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/10/1988
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/10/1988
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/10/1988
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 03/15/1988
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 03/15/1988
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 03/15/1988
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/15/1988
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/16/1988
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 03/21/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/21/1988
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/21/1988
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 03/22/1988
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/23/1988
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/23/1988
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 03/23/1988
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/29/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/29/1988
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/29/1988
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 04/27/1988
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/27/1988
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 04/27/1988
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 04/27/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/27/1988
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/02/1988
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 05/02/1988
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 05/02/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/03/1988
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/03/1988
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/05/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/17/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 05/24/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/24/1988
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 05/24/1988
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/02/1988