Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 02/25/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/08/1988
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/08/1988
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/08/1988
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 03/08/1988
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 03/08/1988
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 03/08/1988
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/08/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 03/08/1988
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 03/08/1988
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/08/1988
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/08/1988
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 03/08/1988
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 03/08/1988
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/08/1988
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 03/08/1988
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 03/08/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 03/08/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 03/08/1988
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/08/1988
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 03/08/1988
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 03/08/1988
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 03/08/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/08/1988
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 03/08/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/15/1988
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 03/15/1988
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1] 03/15/1988
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/15/1988
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 03/15/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 03/15/1988
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 03/15/1988
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 03/15/1988
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 03/15/1988
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 03/15/1988
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/15/1988
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/15/1988
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/15/1988
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 03/15/1988
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/15/1988
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 03/15/1988
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/15/1988
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 03/15/1988
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/15/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 03/15/1988
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/15/1988
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 03/15/1988
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 03/30/1988
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/30/1988
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 03/30/1988
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 03/30/1988
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/30/1988
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 03/30/1988
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 03/30/1988
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7] 03/30/1988
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 03/30/1988
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2] 03/30/1988
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 03/30/1988
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 04/28/1988
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/28/1988
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/28/1988
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/28/1988
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/28/1988
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/28/1988
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 04/28/1988
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 04/28/1988
Rep. Konnyu, Ernest L. [R-CA-12] 05/12/1988