Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 02/25/1988
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/09/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/09/1988
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 03/09/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/09/1988
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/09/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 03/16/1988
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 03/16/1988
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/16/1988
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 03/16/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 03/16/1988
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/16/1988
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 04/11/1988
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 04/11/1988
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 04/11/1988
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 04/11/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/11/1988
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/11/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/11/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 04/13/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 04/13/1988
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 05/11/1988
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 07/12/1988
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/12/1988
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/12/1988
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 07/14/1988