Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to suspend for a 5-year period the duty on disperse yellow 27 dye.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/08/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
07/06/1988Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Commerce.
05/12/1988Executive Comment Received From ITC.
03/31/1988Executive Comment Requested from State, Treasury, Commerce, Labor, ITC, USTR.
03/11/1988Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/08/1988Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/08/1988Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/08/1988 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade03/11/1988 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4103.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4103. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/08/1988)

Amends the Tariff Schedules of the United States to suspend the duty on disperse yellow 27 (dye) for a five-year period.