Committees: H.R.4127 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs03/09/1988 Referred to
08/03/1988 Markup by
09/22/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-944 Part 1
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands03/17/1988 Referred to
06/24/1988 Hearings by
07/28/1988 Reported by
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries09/22/1988 Referred to
09/28/1988 Discharged from
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment09/27/1988 Referred to
09/28/1988 Discharged from