Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Nuclear Investigations Improvement Act of 1988

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to require an Office of Investigations within the Nuclear Regulatory Commission.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
10/05/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
09/29/1988Reported to House by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 100-878 (Part II).
08/11/1988Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-878 (Part I).
03/10/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
10/07/1988SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
10/06/1988SenateReceived in the Senate.
10/05/1988HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
10/05/1988HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
09/29/1988HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 594.
09/29/1988HouseReported to House by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 100-878 (Part II).
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/27/1988HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/27/1988HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/22/1988HouseHouse Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an Extension for Further Consideration Ending not Later Than September 29, 1988.
08/26/1988HouseHouse Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an Extension for Further Consideration Ending not Later Than September 26, 1988.
08/11/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce Sequentially, for a Period Ending not Later than Sep 9, 88.
08/11/1988HouseReported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-878 (Part I).
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
07/27/1988HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
07/27/1988HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
07/12/1988HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment
07/12/1988HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment
04/26/1988HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment
03/17/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
03/10/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
03/10/1988HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs03/10/1988 Referred to
07/27/1988 Markup by
08/11/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-878 Part 1
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment03/17/1988 Referred to
04/26/1988 Hearings by
07/12/1988 Markup by
07/12/1988 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce08/11/1988 Referred to
09/27/1988 Markup by
09/29/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-878 Part 2
Senate Environment and Public Works10/07/1988 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4140. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/10/1988)

Nuclear Investigations Improvement Act of 1988 - Amends the Energy Reorganization Act of 1974 to establish within the Nuclear Regulatory Commission the Office of Investigations, to be headed by a Director of Investigations who shall be appointed by, and report directly to, the Commission.

Confers responsibility upon the Office to investigate violations within the Commission's jurisdiction where information indicates that such violations were either willfully caused or the result of careless disregard for regulatory requirements. Requires the Director to report violations of Federal criminal law to the Commission and to the Justice Department. Requires Commission employees to report to the Office information indicating that violations were either willfully caused or were the result of careless disregard for regulatory requirements.