Committees: H.R.4140 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs03/10/1988 Referred to
07/27/1988 Markup by
08/11/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-878 Part 1
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment03/17/1988 Referred to
04/26/1988 Hearings by
07/12/1988 Markup by
07/12/1988 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce08/11/1988 Referred to
09/27/1988 Markup by
09/29/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-878 Part 2
Senate Environment and Public Works10/07/1988 Referred to