Committees: H.R.4150 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Operations03/15/1988 Referred to
06/09/1988 Markup by
06/17/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-656 Part 2
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security03/21/1988 Referred to
06/07/1988 Hearings by
06/07/1988 Markup by
06/07/1988 Reported by
House Post Office and Civil Service03/15/1988 Referred to
05/11/1988 Markup by
05/25/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-656 Part 1
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Postal Operations and Services03/21/1988 Referred to
05/10/1988 Markup by
05/10/1988 Reported by
Senate Budget06/22/1988 Referred to
Senate Governmental Affairs06/22/1988 Referred to