Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11]* 03/15/1988
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3]* 03/15/1988
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 03/15/1988
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 03/17/1988
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/17/1988
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/17/1988
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/17/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 03/22/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 03/22/1988
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 03/22/1988
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/22/1988
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 03/23/1988
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/29/1988
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/30/1988