Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to designate the building located at 445 Broadway in Albany, New York, as the "James T. Foley United States Post Office and Courthouse".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/14/1988Became Public Law No: 100-489.
10/14/1988Signed by President.
10/11/1988Presented to President.
10/04/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/04/1988Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/22/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
08/10/1988Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 100-859.
03/16/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
10/14/1988Became Public Law No: 100-489.
10/14/1988Signed by President.
10/11/1988HousePresented to President.
10/07/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/04/1988SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
10/04/1988SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/1988SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
09/23/1988SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/22/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/22/1988HouseCalled up by House on Call of Consent Calendar.
09/22/1988HouseH.Amdt.897 Amendment Passed House by Voice Vote.
09/22/1988HouseH.Amdt.897 Amendment Offered.
08/10/1988HousePlaced on Consent Calendar No: 26.
08/10/1988HousePlaced on House Calendar No: 200.
08/10/1988HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Public Works and Transportation. Report No: 100-859.
08/04/1988HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
08/04/1988HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
08/02/1988HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
08/02/1988HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
08/02/1988HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds
03/28/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
03/16/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
03/16/1988HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Public Works and Transportation03/16/1988 Referred to
08/04/1988 Markup by
08/10/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-859
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds03/28/1988 Referred to
08/02/1988 Hearings by
08/02/1988 Markup by
08/02/1988 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works09/26/1988 Referred to
10/04/1988 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4188.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4188. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/22/1988)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Designates the United States Post Office and Courthouse at 445 Broadway in Albany, New York, as the James T. Foley United States Courthouse.