Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Section 457 Clarification Act of 1988

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to clarify that section 457 does not apply to nonelective deferred compensation or basic employee benefits.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/22/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
11/10/1988Provisions of Measure Incorporated Into H.R.4333.
03/22/1988Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/22/1988Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (105)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 03/22/1988
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/30/1988
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/12/1988
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 04/26/1988
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 04/26/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 04/26/1988
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/26/1988
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/26/1988
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 04/26/1988
Rep. Konnyu, Ernest L. [R-CA-12] 04/28/1988
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 04/28/1988
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 04/28/1988
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/02/1988
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 05/02/1988
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 05/02/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/03/1988
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/03/1988
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 05/09/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 05/09/1988
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 05/09/1988
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 05/10/1988
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 05/10/1988
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/10/1988
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 05/12/1988
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/12/1988
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 05/12/1988
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 05/17/1988
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 05/17/1988
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 05/17/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/17/1988
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/17/1988
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/18/1988
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 05/18/1988
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/18/1988
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 05/18/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/18/1988
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/18/1988
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 05/24/1988
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 05/24/1988
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/24/1988
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 05/24/1988
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/24/1988
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/01/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/01/1988
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 06/01/1988
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/01/1988
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/01/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/01/1988
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 06/01/1988
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/01/1988
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/01/1988
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 06/01/1988
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/07/1988
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 06/07/1988
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 06/07/1988
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 06/07/1988
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/07/1988
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/07/1988
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 06/14/1988
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 06/14/1988
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/14/1988
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/14/1988
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/14/1988
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 06/14/1988
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 06/14/1988
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/14/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/14/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/14/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/14/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/15/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/15/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 06/16/1988
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 06/20/1988
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 06/28/1988
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 06/28/1988
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 06/28/1988
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/28/1988
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 06/28/1988
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/06/1988
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/06/1988
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/06/1988
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 07/06/1988
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/06/1988
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 07/06/1988
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 07/07/1988
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/12/1988
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 07/12/1988
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 07/12/1988
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/14/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/14/1988
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 07/26/1988
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/26/1988
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 07/26/1988
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 07/26/1988
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 07/26/1988
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 07/26/1988
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 08/03/1988
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 08/03/1988
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 08/11/1988
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 08/11/1988
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/19/1988
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 10/19/1988
Rep. Sweeney, David McCann [R-TX-14] 10/19/1988
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 10/19/1988
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/19/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/22/1988 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4221. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/22/1988)

Section 457 Clarification Act of 1988 - Amends Internal Revenue Code accounting rules governing the year of inclusion of compensation deferred under qualified plans of State and local governments and of private tax-exempt organizations. Declares the rules to be inapplicable to both nonelective deferred compensation and basic employee benefits, including bona fide vacation plans, sick leave plans, sabbatical leave, and similar benefits.