Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2]* 03/23/1988
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 03/23/1988
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20]* 03/23/1988
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 03/23/1988
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 03/23/1988
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 03/23/1988
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 03/23/1988
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 03/23/1988
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 03/31/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 03/31/1988
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 03/31/1988
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/31/1988
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/31/1988
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/31/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/31/1988
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 03/31/1988
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/31/1988
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/31/1988
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/31/1988
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/31/1988
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/31/1988
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 03/31/1988
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 03/31/1988
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 03/31/1988
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 03/31/1988
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/31/1988
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2] 03/31/1988
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 03/31/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 04/19/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/19/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 04/19/1988
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 04/19/1988
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/19/1988
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/19/1988
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 04/19/1988
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 04/19/1988
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 04/19/1988
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 04/19/1988
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 04/19/1988
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 04/19/1988
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/19/1988
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 04/19/1988
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 04/19/1988
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/19/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 04/19/1988
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 04/19/1988
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/19/1988
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/19/1988
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/19/1988
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 04/19/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 04/19/1988
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/19/1988
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 04/19/1988
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 04/19/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/19/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 04/19/1988
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 04/19/1988
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/19/1988
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 04/19/1988
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 04/19/1988
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/19/1988
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 05/02/1988
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 05/02/1988
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 05/02/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 05/02/1988
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/02/1988
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/02/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/02/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 05/02/1988
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 05/02/1988
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/02/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/02/1988
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/02/1988
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 05/02/1988
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/19/1988
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/19/1988
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/19/1988
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/19/1988
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 05/19/1988
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 05/19/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/19/1988
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/19/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/19/1988
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 05/19/1988
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/19/1988
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 05/19/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/19/1988
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 05/19/1988
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/21/1988
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/21/1988
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 06/21/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/21/1988
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 06/21/1988
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/21/1988
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 08/02/1988

Show cosponsors who withdrew