Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 03/31/1988
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/31/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 03/31/1988
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/03/1988
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 05/03/1988
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 05/03/1988
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 05/03/1988
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 05/03/1988
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 05/03/1988
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 05/03/1988
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 05/03/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/03/1988
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/03/1988
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/03/1988
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 05/03/1988
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/03/1988
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/03/1988
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/03/1988
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 05/25/1988
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 05/25/1988
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/25/1988
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/25/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/25/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/25/1988
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 05/25/1988
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/14/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/14/1988
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 06/14/1988
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 07/27/1988
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 08/02/1988
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 08/02/1988