Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Civil Service Annuity Prompt Payment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend chapter 83 of title 5, United States Code, to provide that unless individuals who are entitled to civil service retirement benefits receive their initial annuity payments promptly, such individuals shall be entitled to receive interest on the delayed payments.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/12/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/29/1988Referred to Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
04/29/1988Executive Comment Requested from OMB, OPM.
04/12/1988Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/12/1988Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 04/12/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/12/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 04/12/1988
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/28/1988
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 04/28/1988
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 04/28/1988
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 04/28/1988
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/28/1988
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/28/1988
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/28/1988
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 05/10/1988
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/10/1988
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 05/10/1988
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 06/08/1988
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/08/1988
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/08/1988
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 06/08/1988
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/08/1988
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 07/13/1988
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 07/13/1988
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/13/1988
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 07/13/1988
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/13/1988
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/20/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service04/12/1988 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits04/29/1988 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4361.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4361. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/12/1988)

Civil Service Annuity Prompt Payment Act - Requires civil service retirement annuity payments and survivor annuity payments to begin 90 days after the later of: (1) the annuity's commencement date; or (2) the date on which the Office of Personnel Management receives a completed application. Requires the payment of interest on the initial underpayment of annuity if no monthly payment is made within the 90-day period, or if one or more monthly annuity payments are made within such period but the amount of payment is deficient.