Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Recreation and Public Purposes Amendment Act of 1988

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Recreation and Public Purposes Amendment Act of 1988

Short Titles as Reported to House

Recreation and Public Purposes Amendment of 1988

Short Titles as Introduced

Recreation and Public Purposes Amendment Act of 1988

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Recreation and Public Purposes Amendment Act of 1988

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend section 3 of the Act of June 14, 1926, as amended (43 U.S.C. 869-2), to authorize the issuance of patents with a limited reverter provision of lands devoted to solid waste disposal, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
11/10/1988Became Public Law No: 100-648.
11/10/1988Signed by President.
11/03/1988Presented to President.
10/21/1988Resolving differences -- House actions: House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
10/21/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
09/30/1988Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/20/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/16/1988Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-934.
04/12/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
11/10/1988Became Public Law No: 100-648.
11/10/1988Signed by President.
11/03/1988HousePresented to President.
11/02/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/21/1988HouseHouse Agreed to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
10/21/1988SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
10/21/1988SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
10/21/1988SenateS.Amdt.3763 Amendment SP 3763 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/21/1988SenateS.Amdt.3764 Amendment SP 3764 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/21/1988SenateS.Amdt.3764 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Johnston. To provide that the Secretary shall not make conveyance of land or renunciation of of reversionary interests under the Act until he has published in the Federal Register regulations implementing the Act until 60 days after these regulations have been submitted to designated commissions of the Congress.
10/21/1988SenateS.Amdt.3763 Proposed by Senator Warner for Senator McClure. Of a techincal nature.
09/30/1988SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1020.
09/30/1988SenateSenate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/23/1988SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
09/22/1988SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/20/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/20/1988HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
09/16/1988HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 560.
09/16/1988HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-934.
09/14/1988HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
09/14/1988HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/08/1988HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
05/24/1988HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
05/05/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
04/12/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
04/12/1988HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs04/12/1988 Referred to
09/14/1988 Markup by
09/16/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-934
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands05/05/1988 Referred to
09/08/1988 Hearings by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/22/1988 Referred to
09/30/1988 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests09/23/1988 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4362. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/21/1988)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Recreation and Public Purposes Amendment Act of 1988 - Allows the Secretary of the Interior to convey lands which may be used by the applicant for the disposal of solid wastes or hazardous substances subject to the following conditions: (1) the Secretary determines that no hazardous substance is present on such land; (2) the applicant furnishes evidence that a copy of the application and information concerning the proposed use of such land has been provided to the Environmental Protection Agency and certain other State and Federal agencies; (3) the applicant gives a warranty that use of such land will be consistent with applicable State and Federal laws and that the applicant will hold the United States harmless from any liability; and (4) the applicant demonstrates that the land meets applicable State and local requirements and needs for solid waste or hazardous substance disposal.

Provides that such lands shall revert to the United States unless the lands have been used for the purposes specified in the application or other authorized uses within five years after the date of conveyance.

Requires any party who has transferred ownership of any conveyed lands not used for such specified purposes to pay to the Secretary fair market value for such lands.

Provides that no lands covered by an issued patent shall revert to the United States if such lands have been used for the disposal of solid waste or hazardous substances.

Authorizes the Secretary, with respect to lands conveyed prior to enactment of this Act, to renounce the United States' reversionary interests in such lands upon finding that such lands have been used for the disposal of solid waste or hazardous substances.

Authorizes the Secretary, with respect to lands leased prior to enactment of this Act, to convey in fee such leased lands without any provision for reversion to the United States upon finding that such lands have been used for the disposal of solid waste or hazardous substances.

Prohibits the Secretary from making any conveyance of land or renunciation of reversionary interests under this Act until: (1) 60 days after regulations implementing this Act have been submitted to specified House and Senate committees; and (2) 30 days after notice of intention to make such conveyance or renunciation has been submitted to specified House and Senate committees, during the first three years after enactment of this Act.