Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitten, Jamie L. [D-MS-1]* 04/13/1988
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8]* 04/13/1988
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4]* 04/13/1988
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 04/13/1988
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5]* 04/13/1988
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2]* 04/13/1988
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4]* 04/13/1988
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 04/13/1988
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 04/13/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 04/21/1988
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 04/21/1988
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/21/1988
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/29/1988
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/29/1988
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 04/29/1988
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/29/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 04/29/1988
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2] 04/29/1988
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 04/29/1988
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 05/04/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 05/04/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 05/04/1988
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/04/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/04/1988
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/04/1988
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/04/1988
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/04/1988
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/11/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/11/1988
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/11/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/11/1988
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 05/11/1988
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/26/1988
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/26/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 05/26/1988
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 06/08/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/08/1988
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/08/1988
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 06/15/1988
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/15/1988
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 06/29/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/29/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/29/1988
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/29/1988
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/06/1988
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 07/06/1988
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/06/1988
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 07/06/1988
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/06/1988
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/08/1988
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 09/08/1988