Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Michigan Public Lands Improvement Act of 1988

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Michigan Public Lands Improvement Act of 1988

Short Titles as Reported to House

Michigan Public Lands Improvement Act of 1988

Short Titles as Introduced

Michigan Public Lands Improvement Act of 1988

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to improve the management of certain public lands in the State of Michigan.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/28/1988Became Public Law No: 100-537.
10/28/1988Signed by President.
10/21/1988Presented to President.
10/11/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/22/1988Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston without amendment. With written report No. 100-537.
07/11/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/07/1988Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-758.
04/13/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
10/28/1988Became Public Law No: 100-537.
10/28/1988Signed by President.
10/21/1988HousePresented to President.
10/14/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/12/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/11/1988SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/22/1988SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 972.
09/22/1988SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston without amendment. With written report No. 100-537.
09/19/1988SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Interior Department, OMB.
09/14/1988SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/13/1988SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
07/13/1988SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
07/12/1988SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/11/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/11/1988HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
07/07/1988HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 459.
07/07/1988HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-758.
06/22/1988HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
06/22/1988HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
06/16/1988HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
06/16/1988HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
06/16/1988HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
05/24/1988HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
05/05/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
04/13/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
04/13/1988HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs04/13/1988 Referred to
06/22/1988 Markup by
07/07/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-758
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands05/05/1988 Referred to
06/16/1988 Hearings by
06/16/1988 Markup by
06/16/1988 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/12/1988 Referred to
09/14/1988 Markup by
09/22/1988 Reported by S.Rept 100-537
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests07/13/1988 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4375.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4375. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/11/1988)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Michigan Public Lands Improvement Act of 1988 - Grants to the State of Michigan the right, title, and interest of the United States in and to certain public uplands and islands in Michigan waters which were not subject to any claim on January 1, 1988.

Allows the Secretary of the Interior to sell certain other lands which were subject to a claim identified on the records of the Bureau of Land Management as of that date to the claimants following resolution of conflicting claims.

Deems title to public lands which, on the date of enactment of this Act, was subject to leases issued to the State of Michigan under the Recreation and Public Purposes Act to have vested in the State and to be exempt from Department of the Interior regulations governing leases under such Act. Allows the State to receive, under this Act, lands previously patented to the State under such Act by notifying the Secretary that it intends to relinquish such lands to the United States. Requires the Secretary to transfer such lands back to the State subject to the provisions of this Act, effective simultaneously with the State's relinquishment of such lands.

Authorizes the Secretary to sell and issue a patent to a tract of public land located in Michigan where the Secretary determines that: (1) such tract does not exceed 1,500 acres and is difficult and uneconomic to manage as part of the public lands and is not suitable for management by another Federal department or agency; and (2) such sale would not be inconsistent with land use plans developed in accordance with the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976. Allows the Secretary, following adjudication of any claims, to convey such land at fair market value, less equities presented by an applicant for such conveyance (such as the amount paid for the land, longevity of the applicant's claim, and taxes paid on the land) and less the value of any improvements. Provides for description of tracts of such land conveyed on the approved Federal plat of survey. Authorizes the Secretary to either: (1) convey title to a qualified trustee, where a tract does not conform to an existing survey plat, in order to conform the legal description to such plat; or (2) require the applicant to reimburse the United States for the cost of preparing a plat of survey. Prohibits the sale of such lands unless the Secretary, before 30 days prior to such sale, publishes notice in a newspaper of general circulation in the county where the tract is located.

Reserves to the United States all mineral rights in the lands transferred under this Act.

Prohibits the conveyance or transfer of such lands by Michigan to any person or entity other than a political subdivision of the State.

Authorizes the use of such lands only for purposes of public recreation or protection of fish, wildlife, plants, or other natural resources and values.

Directs the Secretary to take steps to notify Michigan residents of the uplands and islands to be granted or otherwise transferred to the State. Requires Michigan to notify the Secretary with regard to any grant or transfer of such lands by the State to a political subdivision. Requires the State to submit to the Secretary a report within five years of enactment of this Act, and every five years thereafter, as to the present ownership, management, and use of the lands granted or otherwise transferred.

Sets forth enforcement procedures.

Declares that nothing in this Act shall be construed as affecting the jurisdiction or responsibilities of the State with respect to fish and wildlife in any lands granted or transferred to the State under this Act.