Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to require a health warning on the labels of bottles containing alcoholic beverages.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/21/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
10/22/1988See H.R.5210.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/09/1988Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/21/1988Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/21/1988Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (52)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 05/03/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/03/1988
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/03/1988
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/03/1988
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/26/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 05/26/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/26/1988
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 05/26/1988
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/26/1988
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/26/1988
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 05/26/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/21/1988
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 06/21/1988
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/21/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/29/1988
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/29/1988
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 06/29/1988
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/29/1988
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/29/1988
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 06/29/1988
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 06/29/1988
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 07/06/1988
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/06/1988
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/06/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 07/06/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/26/1988
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 07/26/1988
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/26/1988
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 07/26/1988
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/09/1988
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 09/09/1988
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 05/03/1988 07/07/1988 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/21/1988 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment05/09/1988 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4441. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/21/1988)

Amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to require one of several specified health warnings to appear on the labels of bottles containing alcoholic beverages.

Specifies required contents, including warnings relating alcohol consumption to birth defects, impairment of driving ability, hypertension, liver disease, and possible addiction.

Directs that each such warning: (1) be in a conspicuous and prominent place on the container; (2) be randomly displayed by a manufacturer or packager in as equal a number of times as is possible on each brand of the beverage; and (3) be randomly distributed in all parts of the United States where such brand is marketed.

Exempts from the foregoing requirements alcoholic beverages sold or distributed for export or for consumption outside the United States, except those sold or distributed to members of the U.S. armed forces located outside of the United States.

Provides that compliance with the warning label requirements of this Act does not exempt any person from any common law duty to warn.