Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Undetectable Firearms Act of 1988

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Terrorist Firearms Detection Act of 1988

Short Titles as Reported to House

Terrorist Firearms Detection Act of 1988

Short Titles as Introduced

Terrorist Firearms Detection Act of 1988

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Undetectable Firearms Act of 1988

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit certain firearms especially useful to terrorists.


Actions Overview (11)

Date
11/10/1988Became Public Law No: 100-649.
11/10/1988Signed by President.
11/03/1988Presented to President.
10/21/1988Resolving differences -- House actions: House Agreed to Senate Amendments to House Amendments to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
10/21/1988Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate concurred in the House amendment to the Senate amendment with an amendment (SP 3767) by Voice Vote.
10/20/1988Resolving differences -- House actions: House Concurred, in Senate Amendments , with Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
05/25/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate in lieu of S. 2180 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/25/1988Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/10/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 413 - 4 (Record Vote No: 118).
05/10/1988Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-612.
04/21/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
11/10/1988Became Public Law No: 100-649.
11/10/1988Signed by President.
11/03/1988HousePresented to President.
11/02/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/21/1988HouseHouse Agreed to Senate Amendments to House Amendments to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
10/21/1988SenateSenate concurred in the House amendment to the Senate amendment with an amendment (SP 3767) by Voice Vote.
10/21/1988SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
10/21/1988SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
10/21/1988SenateS.Amdt.3767 Amendment SP 3767 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/21/1988SenateS.Amdt.3767 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Metzenbaum. To provide that, at the close of the 12-month period and at appropriate times thereafter, the Secretary shall promulgate regulations to permit the manufacture, importation, sale, shipment, delivery, possession, transfer, or receipt of firearms previously prohibited that are as detectable as a "security Exemplar" which contain 3.7 ounces of material type 17-4 PH stainless steel, in a shape of a handgun and for other purposes.
10/20/1988HouseHouse Concurred, in Senate Amendments , with Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
05/26/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/25/1988SenatePassed Senate in lieu of S. 2180 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/25/1988SenateSenate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 2180 amended.
05/25/1988SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/11/1988SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
05/10/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 413 - 4 (Record Vote No: 118).
05/10/1988HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
05/10/1988HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 364.
05/10/1988HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-612.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/28/1988HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/28/1988HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/21/1988HouseFor Previous Action See H.R.2845.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/21/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
04/21/1988HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/21/1988 Referred to
04/28/1988 Markup by
05/10/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-612
Senate Judiciary05/11/1988 Referred to
05/25/1988 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4445. View summaries

Shown Here:
Senate agreed to House amendment with amendment (10/21/1988)

(Senate agreed to House amendment with an amendment)

Undetectable Firearms Act of 1988 - Amends the Federal criminal code to make it unlawful to manufacture, import, sell, ship, deliver, possess, transfer, or receive any firearm: (1) which is not as detectable as the Security Exemplar (after the removal of grips, stocks, and magazines) by walk-through metal detectors calibrated and operated to detect the Exemplar; or (2) of which any major component, when subjected to inspection by x-ray machines commonly used at airports, does not generate an image that accurately depicts the shape of the component.

Defines the term "Security Exemplar" to mean an object that is suitable for testing and calibrating metal detectors and is, during the 12-month period beginning on the date of enactment of this Act, constructed of 3.7 ounces of stainless steel in a shape resembling a handgun. Directs the Secretary of the Treasury, at the close of such 12-month period and at appropriate times thereafter, to promulgate regulations to permit the manufacture, importation, sale, shipment, delivery, possession, transfer, or receipt of firearms that are as detectable as a security exemplar which contains 3.7 ounces of stainless steel or such lesser amount as is detectable in view of advances in state-of-the-art developments in weapons detection technology.

States that no provision of this Act shall not apply to: (1) the manufacture, possession, transfer, receipt, shipment, or delivery of a firearm by a licensed manufacturer for the purpose of examining and testing such firearm to determine whether it would be prohibited by this Act; and (2) any firearm which has been certified by the Secretary of Defense or the Director of Central Intelligence as necessary for military or intelligence applications and is manufactured for and sold exclusively to military or intelligence agencies of the United States.

Permits the conditional importation of firearms for the purpose of examination and testing to determine whether the importation of such firearms will be allowed under this Act.

Provides an exemption from such prohibition for any firearm possessed in the United States before the enactment of this Act.

Provides criminal penalties for violations of this Act.

Prohibits the Secretary from authorizing the importation of undetectable firearms.

Directs the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration to conduct research to improve the effectiveness of airport security metal detectors and airport security x-ray systems.

Directs the Attorney General, the Secretary, and the Secretary of Transportation to conduct studies to identify available equipment capable of detecting the Security Exemplar while distinguishing innocuous metal objects.

Repeals such prohibition ten years after the effective date of this Act.