Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4]* 04/21/1988
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/21/1988
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Konnyu, Ernest L. [R-CA-12]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8]* 04/21/1988
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13]* 04/21/1988
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/21/1988
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 04/21/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 04/21/1988
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 04/28/1988
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/28/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/28/1988
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/28/1988
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 04/28/1988
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 04/28/1988
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 04/28/1988
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/28/1988
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 04/28/1988
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 04/28/1988
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 04/28/1988
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 04/28/1988
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 04/28/1988
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 04/28/1988
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 04/28/1988
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/28/1988
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/28/1988
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 04/28/1988
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 04/28/1988
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 04/28/1988
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 04/28/1988
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 04/28/1988
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 04/28/1988
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 04/28/1988
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 04/28/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/28/1988
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/28/1988
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 04/28/1988
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14] 04/28/1988
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 04/28/1988
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 04/28/1988
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 04/28/1988
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7] 04/28/1988
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 04/28/1988
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/28/1988
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 04/28/1988
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 04/28/1988
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 04/28/1988
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/28/1988
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/28/1988
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 04/28/1988
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 04/28/1988
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 04/28/1988
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 04/28/1988
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 04/28/1988
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 04/28/1988
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 04/28/1988
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 04/28/1988
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/28/1988
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/28/1988
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 04/28/1988
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 04/28/1988
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/28/1988
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/28/1988
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 04/28/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 05/10/1988
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 05/10/1988
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 05/10/1988
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/10/1988
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/10/1988
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/10/1988
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/10/1988
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/10/1988
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 05/10/1988
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 05/10/1988
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/10/1988
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 05/10/1988
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 05/25/1988
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/03/1988
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 06/16/1988
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 06/16/1988
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/16/1988
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 07/12/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 07/12/1988