Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Parimutuel Licensing Simplification Act of 1988

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Parimutuel Licensing Simplification Act of 1988

Short Titles as Reported to House

Parimutuel Licensing Simplification Act of 1988

Short Titles as Introduced

Parimutuel Licensing Simplification Act of 1988

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to simplify the process of obtaining licensing by States for participation in parimutuel wagering by allowing consolidated requests to be made to the Federal Government for identification and criminal history records relating to the applicant for such licensing.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/22/1988Became Public Law No: 100-413.
08/22/1988Signed by President.
08/12/1988Presented to President.
08/11/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
08/08/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
08/08/1988Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-832.
04/26/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
08/22/1988Became Public Law No: 100-413.
08/22/1988Signed by President.
08/12/1988HousePresented to President.
08/12/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
08/11/1988SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
08/10/1988SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
08/08/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
08/08/1988HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
08/08/1988HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-832.
08/02/1988HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
08/02/1988HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/07/1988HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights
07/07/1988HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights
04/28/1988HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights
04/28/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/26/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
04/26/1988HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 04/26/1988
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 04/26/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/26/1988 Referred to
08/02/1988 Markup by
08/08/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-832
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights04/28/1988 Referred to
04/28/1988 Hearings by
07/07/1988 Markup by
07/07/1988 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4458. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (08/08/1988)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Parimutuel Licensing Simplification Act of 1988 - Allows any association of State officials regulating parimutuel wagering, for licensing and employment purposes, to submit fingerprints to the Attorney General for identification and criminal history records checks.