Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to protect certain pensions and other benefits of veterans and survivors of veterans who are entitled to damages in the case of In re: "Agent Orange" Product Liability Litigation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/28/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/28/1988Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/1988Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 07/06/1988
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/07/1988
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 07/27/1988
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 07/27/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 08/01/1988
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 08/01/1988
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 08/01/1988
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 08/01/1988
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/02/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 08/02/1988
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 08/02/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 08/02/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 08/04/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 08/04/1988
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 08/04/1988
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 08/04/1988
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 08/04/1988
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 08/04/1988
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 08/08/1988
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 08/08/1988
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 08/08/1988
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 08/08/1988
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 08/08/1988
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 08/08/1988
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 08/09/1988
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 08/09/1988
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 08/11/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/07/1988
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/07/1988
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/07/1988
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/07/1988
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 09/07/1988
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 09/16/1988
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 09/16/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/16/1988
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/16/1988
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 09/22/1988
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/22/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/28/1988 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4479. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/28/1988)

Prohibits the Administrator of Veterans Affairs from taking into consideration any payment to any person pursuant to the settlement in the case of In re: "Agent Orange" Product Liability Litigation in determining: (1) eligibility to receive a veterans' pension; (2) the amount of any such pension; or (3) the amount of such person's attributable income for purposes of eligibility for certain medical benefits.