Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1]* 04/28/1988
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2]* 04/28/1988
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 04/29/1988
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/29/1988
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 04/29/1988
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/29/1988
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/29/1988
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 04/29/1988
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/29/1988
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 04/29/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 04/29/1988
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/29/1988
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/29/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/29/1988
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 04/29/1988
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 04/29/1988
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 04/29/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 04/29/1988
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/29/1988
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/29/1988
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 04/29/1988
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 04/29/1988
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 04/29/1988
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 04/29/1988
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 04/29/1988
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 04/29/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/29/1988
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/29/1988
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 04/29/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 04/29/1988
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 04/29/1988
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 04/29/1988
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 04/29/1988
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/29/1988
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/29/1988
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 04/29/1988
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 04/29/1988
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/29/1988
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/29/1988
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2] 04/29/1988
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 04/29/1988
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 04/29/1988
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 04/29/1988
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/29/1988
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/29/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 04/29/1988
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 04/29/1988
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 04/29/1988
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 04/29/1988
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/29/1988
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 04/29/1988
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 04/29/1988
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/29/1988
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/29/1988
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 04/29/1988
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 04/29/1988
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/29/1988
Rep. Konnyu, Ernest L. [R-CA-12] 04/29/1988
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 04/29/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/29/1988
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 04/29/1988
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/29/1988
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 04/29/1988
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 04/29/1988
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 04/29/1988
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 04/29/1988
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 04/29/1988
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 04/29/1988
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/29/1988
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/29/1988
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/29/1988
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 04/29/1988
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/29/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 04/29/1988
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/29/1988
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/29/1988
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 04/29/1988
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 04/29/1988
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/29/1988
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 04/29/1988
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/29/1988
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 04/29/1988
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 04/29/1988
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 04/29/1988
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/29/1988
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 04/29/1988
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 04/29/1988
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 04/29/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/29/1988
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 04/29/1988
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 04/29/1988
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 04/29/1988
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/29/1988
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/29/1988
Rep. Sweeney, David McCann [R-TX-14] 04/29/1988
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 04/29/1988
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 04/29/1988
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 04/29/1988
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 04/29/1988
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 04/29/1988
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 05/11/1988
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 05/11/1988
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/11/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/11/1988
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 05/11/1988
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 05/11/1988
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 05/11/1988
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 05/11/1988
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 05/11/1988
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/11/1988
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 05/11/1988
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 05/11/1988
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/11/1988
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 05/11/1988
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 05/11/1988
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/11/1988
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/11/1988
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/11/1988
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/11/1988
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/11/1988
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 05/11/1988
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 05/11/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 05/11/1988
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/11/1988
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 05/11/1988
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 05/11/1988
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 05/26/1988
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 05/26/1988
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/26/1988
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 05/26/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 05/26/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/26/1988
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 05/26/1988
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 06/10/1988
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 06/10/1988