Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for payment of hospitals under the DRG prospective payment system on the basis of a blend of hospital-specific rates and a national rate, depending on the degree of variation of costs within specific diagnosis-related groups.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/03/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/09/1988Referred to Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/03/1988Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/03/1988Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 05/03/1988
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 05/13/1988
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/13/1988
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 05/13/1988
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/13/1988
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/13/1988
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 05/13/1988
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 05/13/1988
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 05/13/1988
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 05/13/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/13/1988
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 05/13/1988
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 05/13/1988
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/13/1988
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/13/1988
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/13/1988
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/13/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 05/13/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/26/1988
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/26/1988
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/26/1988
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 05/26/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 05/26/1988
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 05/26/1988
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 05/26/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/26/1988
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 05/26/1988
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 06/08/1988
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 06/08/1988
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 06/08/1988
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 06/08/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/29/1988
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/29/1988
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/03/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 09/07/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/03/1988 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health05/09/1988 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4511.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4511. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/03/1988)

Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to determine the payments to be made to hospitals under Medicare's prospective payment system on the basis of a blend of hospital-specific rates and a national rate, depending on the degree to which costs vary within specific diagnosis-related groups. Eliminates the urban or rural classification of an area as a consideration in hospital payment determinations.

Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services to: (1) identify relevant labor markets for hospitals; (2) establish a methodology to determine the proportion of hospital costs which are wage-related and compare the hospital wage level in each labor market with the national average hospital wage level; and (3) take into account differences among hospitals in part and full-time employment patterns.