Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to increase the dollar amount of defense authorizations for fiscal year 1988 that are subject to transfer for new purposes pursuant to law, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
05/27/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate in lieu of S. 2355 (Section 902) with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/27/1988Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/11/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
05/11/1988House Committee on Armed Services Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/04/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/01/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/27/1988SenateSenate insists on its amendments, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Nunn; Stennis; Exon; Levin; Kennedy; Bingaman; Dixon; Glenn; Gore; Wirth; Shelby; Warner; Thurmond; Humphrey; Cohen; Quayle; Wilson; Gramm; Symms; McCain.
05/27/1988SenatePassed Senate in lieu of S. 2355 (Section 902) with an amendment by Voice Vote.
05/27/1988SenateSenate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 2355. (Section 902).
05/27/1988SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
05/27/1988SenateSenate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/12/1988SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
05/11/1988HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
05/11/1988HouseCalled up by House by Unanimous Consent.
05/11/1988HouseHouse Committee on Armed Services Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/05/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/05/1988HouseExecutive Comment Requested from DOD.
05/04/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Armed Services.
05/04/1988HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/04/1988 Referred to
05/11/1988 Discharged from
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness05/05/1988 Referred to
Senate Armed Services05/12/1988 Referred to
05/27/1988 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4524. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (05/27/1988)

(Measure passed Senate, amended (Inserted certain provisions of S. 2355))

Amends the National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Years 1988 and 1989 to increase the amount of Department of Defense (DOD) authorizations for FY 1988 subject to transfer from $2,000,000 to $4,000,000. Requires the Secretary of Defense, in determining the purposes for which such transfer authority will be used, to ensure that an appropriate portion of such authority is used to transfer to operation and maintenance accounts of DOD for FY 1988 funds for: (1) depot maintenance activities sufficient to reduce service backlogs; and (2) pay of civilian personnel in an amount sufficient to ensure that no such employees are released due to insufficient funding. Directs the Secretary to: (1) give special consideration and priority to DOD civilian employees, readiness, and more efficient acquisition processes; and (2) provide funds for other high-priority readiness items.