Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 05/04/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/10/1988
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 05/10/1988
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 05/10/1988
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 05/10/1988
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 05/10/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/10/1988
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 05/10/1988
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 05/10/1988
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/10/1988
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/10/1988
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 05/10/1988
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 05/10/1988
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/10/1988
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/10/1988
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 05/10/1988
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 05/10/1988
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/10/1988
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/10/1988
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 05/10/1988
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 05/10/1988
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/10/1988
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 05/10/1988
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/10/1988
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 05/10/1988
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 05/10/1988
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/10/1988
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 05/10/1988
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/10/1988
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 05/10/1988
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 05/10/1988
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 05/10/1988
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 05/10/1988
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 05/10/1988
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 05/10/1988
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 05/10/1988
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/10/1988
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 05/10/1988
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/10/1988
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 05/10/1988
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/10/1988
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 05/10/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/10/1988
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/10/1988
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/12/1988
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/12/1988
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 05/12/1988
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 05/12/1988
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 05/12/1988
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 05/12/1988
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/12/1988
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/12/1988
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/12/1988
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 05/12/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/12/1988
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 05/12/1988
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/12/1988
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/12/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 05/12/1988
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 05/12/1988
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 05/12/1988
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/12/1988
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 05/12/1988
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/12/1988
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 05/12/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 05/12/1988
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/12/1988
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/12/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 05/12/1988
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 05/12/1988
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 05/12/1988
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/12/1988
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 05/12/1988
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 05/12/1988
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 05/12/1988
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 05/12/1988
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/12/1988
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 05/12/1988
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 05/12/1988
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/12/1988
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 05/12/1988
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/12/1988
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 05/12/1988
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/17/1988
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/17/1988
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 05/17/1988
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 05/17/1988
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 05/17/1988
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 05/17/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/18/1988
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 05/18/1988
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 05/18/1988
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/18/1988
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/18/1988
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/18/1988
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 05/18/1988
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/18/1988
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/18/1988
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 05/18/1988
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/18/1988
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 05/18/1988
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 05/19/1988
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 05/19/1988
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 05/19/1988
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/19/1988
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 05/19/1988
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 05/19/1988
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/19/1988
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 05/19/1988
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 05/19/1988
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/19/1988
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 05/19/1988
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/19/1988
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 05/19/1988
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 05/19/1988
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 05/19/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/19/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/19/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/19/1988
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 05/19/1988
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/19/1988
Rep. Sweeney, David McCann [R-TX-14] 05/19/1988
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 05/19/1988
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/19/1988
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 05/19/1988
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/19/1988
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 05/19/1988
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/19/1988
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 05/19/1988
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/24/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 05/24/1988
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/24/1988
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/24/1988
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 05/24/1988
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/24/1988
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 05/24/1988
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/24/1988
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 05/24/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/24/1988
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 05/24/1988
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 05/24/1988
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 05/24/1988
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/25/1988
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 05/25/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/25/1988
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/25/1988
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 05/25/1988
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 05/25/1988
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 05/25/1988
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/25/1988
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 05/25/1988
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2] 05/25/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 05/25/1988
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/26/1988
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 05/26/1988
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/26/1988
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 05/26/1988
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/26/1988
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/26/1988
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 05/26/1988
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/26/1988
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 06/01/1988
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 06/01/1988
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 06/01/1988
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 06/01/1988
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 06/01/1988
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/01/1988
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 06/01/1988
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/02/1988
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/02/1988
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 06/02/1988
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 06/02/1988
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 06/02/1988
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/02/1988
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 06/02/1988
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/02/1988
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 07/28/1988
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/28/1988
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/28/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 07/28/1988
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 07/28/1988

Show cosponsors who withdrew