Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill extending permission for the President's Commission on White House Fellows to accept certain donations.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
10/20/1988Became Public Law No: 100-513.
10/20/1988Signed by President.
10/11/1988Presented to President.
10/04/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/26/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/04/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
10/20/1988Became Public Law No: 100-513.
10/20/1988Signed by President.
10/11/1988HousePresented to President.
10/07/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/04/1988SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/30/1988SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1027.
09/26/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/26/1988HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
05/20/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Civil Service.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
05/04/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
05/04/1988HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 05/04/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 08/08/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service05/04/1988 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Civil Service05/20/1988 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4529. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/26/1988)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Authorizes the President's Commission on White House Fellows to accept donations of money, property, and personal services.

Directs the Commission to take action as necessary to ensure that no conflict of interest, or appearance of a conflict of interest, arises from such donations, including: (1) ensuring that donations have no effect on the selection of White House Fellows; and (2) ensuring that donors do not receive any commercial advantage or benefit from their donation. Requires the Commission to keep records of all donations and to make such records available for public inspection.