Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 05/11/1988
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 05/11/1988
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 05/11/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 05/11/1988
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/11/1988
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 05/11/1988
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 06/14/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 07/26/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 08/04/1988
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 09/14/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/16/1988