Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Federal Employees Liability Reform and Tort Compensation Act of 1988

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Federal Employees Liability Reform and Tort Compensation Act of 1988

Short Titles as Reported to House

Federal Employees Liability Reform and Tort Compensation Act of 1988

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Employees Liability Reform and Tort Compensation Act of 1988

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Federal Employees Liability Reform and Tort Compensation Act of 1988

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Federal Employees Liability Reform and Tort Compensation Act of 1988

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 28, United States Code, to provide for an exclusive remedy against the United States for suits based upon certain negligent or wrongful acts or omissions of United States employees committed within the scope of their employment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
11/18/1988Became Public Law No: 100-694.
11/18/1988Signed by President.
11/14/1988Presented to President.
10/20/1988Resolving differences -- House actions: House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
10/12/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
10/05/1988Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment. Without written report.
06/28/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/14/1988Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-700.
05/17/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
11/18/1988Became Public Law No: 100-694.
11/18/1988Signed by President.
11/14/1988HousePresented to President.
11/14/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/20/1988HouseHouse Agreed to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
10/13/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/12/1988SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
10/05/1988SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1113.
10/05/1988SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment. Without written report.
10/05/1988SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/21/1988SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Courts and Administrative Practice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/06/1988SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
06/28/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
06/27/1988HouseConsidered by House Unfinished Business.
06/27/1988HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
06/14/1988HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 421.
06/14/1988HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-700.
05/24/1988HouseOrdered to be Reported.
05/24/1988HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/17/1988HouseFor Previous Action See H.R.4358.
05/17/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
05/17/1988HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/17/1988 Referred to
05/24/1988 Markup by
06/14/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-700
Senate Judiciary07/06/1988 Referred to
10/05/1988 Markup by
10/05/1988 Reported by
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts and Administrative Practice07/21/1988 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4612. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/12/1988)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Federal Employees Liability Reform and Tort Compensation Act of 1988 - Amends the Federal Tort Claims Act to include the judicial and legislative branches of Government within the definition of the term "Federal agency."

States that, for actions brought under such Act, the United States shall be entitled to all defenses otherwise available to an employee of the United States which are based upon judicial or legislative immunity.

Makes such Act the exclusive remedy for actions brought against the United States for injury or loss of property, personal injury, or death resulting from the negligent or wrongful act or omission of a Government employee acting within the scope of his or her office or employment. States that this restriction shall not apply to cognizable actions against Government employees for money damages for a violation of the Constitution.

Provides that, upon certification by the Attorney General or the court that the employee was acting within the scope of the employee's office or employment at the time of the incident out of which the claim arose, any action commenced upon such claim in a U.S. district court shall be deemed an action against the United States under the provisions of such Act, and the United States shall be substituted as the party defendant. States that such certification shall conclusively establish scope of office or employment for the purpose of removing such an action to a U.S. district court.

Institutes a corresponding framework with respect to comparable actions against the Tennessee Valley Authority (TVA), making the TVA the Attorney General's counterpart for certification purposes.