Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to prevent abuses in the Supplemental Loans for Students program under part B of title IV of the Higher Education Act of 1965, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
07/18/1988Became Public Law No: 100-369.
07/18/1988Signed by President.
07/07/1988Presented to President.
06/28/1988Resolving differences -- House actions: House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
06/15/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
06/08/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 408 - 0 (Record Vote No: 170).
06/03/1988Reported to House by House Committee on Education and Labor. Report No: 100-669.
05/19/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
07/18/1988Became Public Law No: 100-369.
07/18/1988Signed by President.
07/07/1988HousePresented to President.
07/06/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
06/28/1988HouseHouse Agreed to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
06/21/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/15/1988SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
06/15/1988SenateMeasure laid before Senate.
06/15/1988SenateS.Amdt.2381 Amendment SP 2381 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
06/15/1988SenateS.Amdt.2381 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Pell. To make certain technical and conforming amendments to the Higher Education Act of 1965.
06/09/1988SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 728. Pursuant to the order of June 8, 1988.
06/08/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 408 - 0 (Record Vote No: 170).
06/07/1988HouseConsidered by House Unfinished Business.
06/07/1988HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
06/03/1988HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 395.
06/03/1988HouseReported to House by House Committee on Education and Labor. Report No: 100-669.
05/24/1988HouseOrdered to be Reported.
05/24/1988HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/19/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
05/19/1988HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor05/19/1988 Referred to
05/24/1988 Markup by
06/03/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-669

No related bill information was received for H.R.4639.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4639. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (06/15/1988)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 (the Act) to remove the exemption for Supplemental Loans for Students (SLS loans) from certain eligibility requirements under title IV (Student Assistance) of the Act. Revises such requirements to provide that SLS and Guaranteed Student Loan (GSL loan) recipients must have: (1) received a determination of eligibility or ineligibility for a Pell Grant for the relevant period of enrollment; and (2) filed an application for such a grant, if determined to be eligible.

Requires, for eligibility for an SLS loan for any period of enrollment, that a student must have: (1) received a determination of need for a GSL loan; and (2) applied for such a loan, if determined to have need for it.

Reduces the amount of an individual's SLS loan eligibility by the amount of such individual's GSL loan eligibility (added to other financial aid).

Revises the conditions of SLS eligibility of undergraduate dependent students. Requires "exceptional" (rather than "extenuating") circumstances to preclude such a student's parents from borrowing under the parent loan (PLUS loan) program. Requires appropriate documentation that such circumstances exist to be maintained in the institution's records to support such determination.

Requires that SLS loans be disbursed in a specified manner to reduce student interest costs. Makes special rules for multiple disbursement also applicable to SLS loans.

Makes students in teacher training programs eligible for GSL loans regardless of specified restrictions on such eligibility.

Provides that, for purposes of Pell Grant need analysis and general student aid need analysis provisions, income tax payments to specified U.S. territories and possessions or to foreign governments shall be treated as Federal income taxes.

Amends guaranteed student loan program provisions of the Act (as amended by the Augustus F. Hawkins-Robert T. Stafford Elementary and Secondary School Improvement Amendments of 1988) to specify that the guaranteed student loan program shall be referred to as the Robert T. Stafford Student Loan Program. (Currently the name is optional.) Requires that guaranteed student loans be known as Stafford Loans.

Amends the Compact of Free Association Act of 1985 (the Compact) to extend the Pell Grant, Supplemental Educational Opportunity Grant, and College Work-Study programs to students who are or will be citizens of the Federated States of Micronesia or the Marshall Islands and who attend postsecondary institutions in the United States, its territories and commonwealths, the Trust Territory of the Pacific Islands, the Federated States of Micronesia, or the Marshall Islands. Makes such extension inapplicable to any student receiving assistance pursuant to specified provisions of the Compact or the Compact with Palau.

Revises title III (Institutional Aid) of the Act to prohibit any historically black college or university which receives funds under part B (Strengthening Historically Black Colleges and Universities) from receiving funds under part A (Strengthening Institutions) of such title. Adds to authorized uses of funds from grants to institutions under part B: (1) faculty development; (2) funds and administrative management, and funds for acquisition of equipment for use in strengthening funds management; and (3) joint use of facilities, such as laboratories and libraries.

Qualifies for part B funds any branch campus of a southern institution of higher education that before September 30, 1986, received a special needs grant and was formally recognized by the National Center for Education Statistics as a Historically Black College or University, but did not qualify as a part B institution or after October 17, 1986.

States that specified provisions for deferment of student loan repayment during internship refer to internships required to begin professional practice or service after January 1, 1986.

Applies specified provisions of the Higher Education Technical Amendments Act of 1987 to loans made under the guaranteed student loan program before, on, or after the date of enactment of such Act.

Delays the effective date of specified regulations relating to new special conditions imposed on an institution's authority to measure academic programs in clock or credit hours.