Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 05/25/1988
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2]* 05/25/1988
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 05/25/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 05/25/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 05/25/1988
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 06/01/1988
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/08/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/15/1988
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/15/1988
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/15/1988
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/16/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/16/1988
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 06/28/1988
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/28/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/28/1988
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/28/1988
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/28/1988
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/28/1988
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 06/28/1988
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/28/1988
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 06/28/1988
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 06/28/1988
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 07/07/1988
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 07/07/1988
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 07/07/1988
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 07/07/1988
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/07/1988
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 07/07/1988
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 07/07/1988
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 07/12/1988
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 07/12/1988
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 07/12/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/14/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 07/26/1988
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 08/04/1988
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 08/04/1988
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/04/1988
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/04/1988
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 08/11/1988
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 08/11/1988
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 08/11/1988
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 08/11/1988
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 09/15/1988
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 09/15/1988
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 09/15/1988
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/15/1988
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/15/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/16/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/16/1988
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/16/1988
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/16/1988
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 09/16/1988
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/16/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 09/23/1988
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 09/23/1988
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 09/30/1988
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 09/30/1988
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/30/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/30/1988
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 10/12/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 10/12/1988
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/12/1988
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 10/13/1988
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 10/21/1988