Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 06/16/1988
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4]* 06/16/1988
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2]* 06/16/1988
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 06/16/1988
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 06/16/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 06/16/1988
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 06/16/1988
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 06/16/1988
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/16/1988
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/28/1988
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 06/28/1988
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 06/28/1988
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 06/28/1988
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 06/28/1988
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 06/28/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/28/1988
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 06/28/1988
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/28/1988
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 06/28/1988
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7] 07/06/1988
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 07/13/1988
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 08/08/1988