Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Wildfire Suppression Assistance Act

Short Titles as Reported to House for portions of this bill
  • National Commission on Natural Resources Disasters Act of 1988
  • Wildfire Protection Assistance Act of 1988

Short Titles as Introduced

Wildfire Protection Assistance Act of 1988

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Secretary of Agriculture and other agency heads to enter into agreements with foreign fire organizations for assistance in wildfire protection.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/20/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/12/1988Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-1079 (Part I).
06/28/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
10/21/1988SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
10/20/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/20/1988HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
10/12/1988HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-1079 (Part I).
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/29/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
07/12/1988HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/12/1988HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
07/12/1988HouseExecutive Comment Received From USDA.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
06/29/1988HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy
06/29/1988HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy
06/29/1988HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy
06/28/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
06/28/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
06/28/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
06/28/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Agriculture.
06/28/1988HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture06/28/1988 Referred to
07/12/1988 Markup by
10/12/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-1079 Part 1
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Forests, Family Farms, and Energy06/28/1988 Referred to
06/29/1988 Hearings by
06/29/1988 Markup by
06/29/1988 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs06/28/1988 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs06/28/1988 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands07/29/1988 Referred to
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry10/21/1988 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4936. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/20/1988)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Wildfire Suppression Assistance Act - Amends the Temporary Emergency Wildfire Suppression Act to make permanent the authority of the Secretary of Agriculture or the Secretary of the Interior to enter into reciprocal agreements with foreign fire organizations for wildfire protection and, in the absence of such an agreement, to accept emergency wildfire protection from a foreign fire organization or provide it to a foreign nation when to do so is in our best interest. Continues, on a permanent basis, the reimbursement of Canada or Canadian fire organizations for U.S. wildfire protection furnished pursuant to specified agreements.