Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to direct the American Battle Monuments Commission to restore, operate, and maintain the Pacific War Memorial and other historical and memorial sites on Corregidor in the Republic of the Philippines.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/20/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
09/16/1988Reported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 100-936.
06/29/1988Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
09/23/1988SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
09/22/1988SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/20/1988HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
09/20/1988HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
09/16/1988HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 561.
09/16/1988HouseReported to House by House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Report No: 100-936.
09/15/1988HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
09/15/1988HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/07/1988HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Housing and Memorial Affairs
09/07/1988HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Housing and Memorial Affairs
09/07/1988HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Housing and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/29/1988HouseReferred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/29/1988HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/29/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 06/29/1988
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 06/29/1988
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 07/11/1988
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 09/16/1988
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/16/1988
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 09/16/1988
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/16/1988

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/29/1988 Referred to
09/15/1988 Markup by
09/16/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-936
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Housing and Memorial Affairs09/07/1988 Referred to
09/07/1988 Markup by
09/07/1988 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/22/1988 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests09/23/1988 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4948.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4948. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/20/1988)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Directs the American Battle Monuments Commission to restore, operate, and maintain the Pacific War Memorial and other historical and memorial sites on Corregidor in the Republic of the Philippines. Specifies that the Commission may do so only after an agreement has been entered into between the United States and the Republic of the Philippines.

Requires the Commission to carry out the purposes of this Act with private funds except to the extent funds are appropriated pursuant to authorizations under this Act. Authorizes the Commission to solicit private contributions. Establishes a fund in the Treasury for the deposit of such contributions. Authorizes appropriations.