Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 07/12/1988
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 07/12/1988
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 07/12/1988
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42]* 07/12/1988
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/12/1988
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 07/12/1988
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 07/26/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/26/1988
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/26/1988
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 07/26/1988
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 07/26/1988
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 07/26/1988
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/26/1988
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 07/26/1988
Rep. Konnyu, Ernest L. [R-CA-12] 07/26/1988
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 07/26/1988
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/26/1988
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 07/26/1988
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 07/26/1988
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 07/26/1988
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 07/26/1988
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 07/26/1988
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 08/02/1988
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 08/02/1988
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 08/02/1988
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 08/02/1988
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 08/02/1988
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 08/11/1988
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 08/11/1988
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 08/11/1988
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 08/11/1988
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 08/11/1988
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 08/11/1988
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/14/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/14/1988
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 09/14/1988
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/14/1988
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 09/14/1988
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 09/14/1988
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 09/14/1988
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 09/26/1988
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 09/26/1988
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/26/1988
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 10/19/1988
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/19/1988
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 10/19/1988
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 10/19/1988
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 10/19/1988
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 10/19/1988
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 10/19/1988