Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 07/14/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 07/14/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 08/11/1988
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 08/11/1988
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 08/11/1988
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/11/1988
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 09/28/1988
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/03/1988
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 10/11/1988
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 10/21/1988